Dismiss Notice
Join Physics Forums Today!
The friendliest, high quality science and math community on the planet! Everyone who loves science is here!

B Swift maths

  1. Dec 22, 2016 #1
    Is there a shortcut method to find 7373×5353 if we know 73×53, or any general formula for this type of questions
     
  2. jcsd
  3. Dec 22, 2016 #2

    ShayanJ

    User Avatar
    Gold Member

    7373x5353=(7300+73)x(5300+53)=73x53x(10000+100+100+1)=73x53x10201
     
  4. Dec 22, 2016 #3
    Finally it will be 3869 ×10201 which still makes it harder to solve, i need a easy method , if it's there.
     
  5. Dec 22, 2016 #4

    Mark44

    Staff: Mentor

    7373 x 5353 = (100 + 1)(73)(100 + 1)(53)
    = (100 + 1)2 (73)(53)
    = 1002 (3869) + 2(100)3869 + 3869
    Each of these products can be done in one's head, and the three results added to get the final product.

    This is the direction that ShayanJ was taking, I believe.
     
    Last edited: Dec 22, 2016
  6. Dec 22, 2016 #5
    Mark44 edit: Fixed my typo above
    It means only simplification will give you a answer, there's no shortcuts like in vedic/swift maths
     
    Last edited by a moderator: Dec 22, 2016
  7. Dec 22, 2016 #6

    Mark44

    Staff: Mentor

    What ShayanJ and I suggested is a shortcut. We can use this technique to do the multiplication mentally, something that most people can't do when they multiply 7373 and 5353 in the usual way.

    I don't know what Vedic or swift maths are.

    Note that "textspeak" such as "u" for "you" is not permitted at this site.
     
Know someone interested in this topic? Share this thread via Reddit, Google+, Twitter, or Facebook

Have something to add?
Draft saved Draft deleted



Similar Discussions: Swift maths
  1. Math Olympiad (Replies: 11)

  2. Categorizing Math (Replies: 52)

Loading...