Easily Multiply Large Numbers: 73×53 & 7373×5353

In summary, the conversation discussed a shortcut method for solving the multiplication of 7373 and 5353. This method involves simplification and can be done mentally. It was mentioned that this is similar to Vedic and swift maths, but it was clarified that it is not the same. The output of this method is 3869 x 10201. The conversation also mentioned the use of textspeak, which is not allowed on this site.
  • #1
parshyaa
307
19
Is there a shortcut method to find 7373×5353 if we know 73×53, or any general formula for this type of questions
 
Mathematics news on Phys.org
  • #2
7373x5353=(7300+73)x(5300+53)=73x53x(10000+100+100+1)=73x53x10201
 
  • Like
Likes parshyaa, jedishrfu and dkotschessaa
  • #3
ShayanJ said:
7373x5353=(7300+73)x(5300+53)=73x53x(10000+100+100+1)=73x53x10201
Finally it will be 3869 ×10201 which still makes it harder to solve, i need a easy method , if it's there.
 
  • #4
7373 x 5353 = (100 + 1)(73)(100 + 1)(53)
= (100 + 1)2 (73)(53)
= 1002 (3869) + 2(100)3869 + 3869
Each of these products can be done in one's head, and the three results added to get the final product.

This is the direction that ShayanJ was taking, I believe.
 
Last edited:
  • #5
Mark44 said:
7373 x 5353 = (100 + 1)(73)(100 + 1)(53)
= (100 + 1)2 (73)(53)
= 1002 (3869) + 2(100)3869 + 3869
Each of these products can be done in one's head, and the three results added to get the final product.

This is the direction that ShayanJ was taking, I believe.
Mark44 edit: Fixed my typo above
It means only simplification will give you a answer, there's no shortcuts like in vedic/swift maths
 
Last edited by a moderator:
  • #6
parshyaa said:
It means only simplification will give u a answer, there's no shortcuts like in vedic/swift maths
What ShayanJ and I suggested is a shortcut. We can use this technique to do the multiplication mentally, something that most people can't do when they multiply 7373 and 5353 in the usual way.

I don't know what Vedic or swift maths are.

... will give u a answer ...
Note that "textspeak" such as "u" for "you" is not permitted at this site.
 
  • Like
Likes parshyaa

Related to Easily Multiply Large Numbers: 73×53 & 7373×5353

1. How do you easily multiply large numbers?

There are several methods for easily multiplying large numbers such as using the distributive property, breaking down numbers into smaller factors, and using estimation. However, one of the most efficient methods is the grid method, where you break down the numbers into their place values and then multiply each place value by the corresponding place value of the other number.

2. Can you provide an example of easily multiplying large numbers using the grid method?

Sure, let's use the example of 73 x 53. First, we draw a grid with two columns and two rows, representing the tens and ones place for each number. Then, we multiply the numbers in each row and column and add them together. So, for 73 x 53, our grid would look like this:

| 7 | 3 |

x| 5 | 3 |

---------

|35|21|

|15| 9 |

---------

Then, we add the numbers diagonally from right to left, carrying over any numbers that are greater than 9. In this case, we would get 3, 8, 9. So our final answer is 3,869.

3. How does the grid method work for multiplying larger numbers like 7373 x 5353?

The grid method can still be used for larger numbers, but the grid would have more rows and columns to represent the additional place values. For example, for 7373 x 5353, our grid would have 4 rows and 4 columns, representing the thousands, hundreds, tens, and ones place for each number. The process would be the same, multiplying each row and column and then adding the diagonally to get the final answer.

4. Are there any other methods for easily multiplying large numbers?

Yes, there are other methods such as using the distributive property, where you break down the numbers into their factors and then multiply them, and using estimation, where you round the numbers to the nearest power of 10 and then multiply. However, the grid method is often the most efficient and accurate method for multiplying large numbers.

5. Can you use the grid method for multiplying decimals?

Yes, the grid method can also be used for multiplying decimals. You would draw a grid with the appropriate number of rows and columns based on the decimal place values, and then multiply each row and column as usual. The final answer would have the decimal point placed based on the total number of decimal places in the original numbers.

Similar threads

  • General Math
Replies
11
Views
1K
Replies
3
Views
680
  • General Math
Replies
1
Views
1K
Replies
3
Views
1K
  • General Math
Replies
7
Views
2K
Replies
1
Views
2K
Replies
4
Views
824
Replies
4
Views
811
Replies
1
Views
1K
Back
Top